EP0790384 - Retractable closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. P.O. Box 5072 Piekstraat 2 3008 AB Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. P.O. Box 5072 Piekstraat 2 3008 AB Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. P.O. Box 5072 Piekstraat 2 NL-3008 AB Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koks, Marinus F. Tristanweg 48 3077 CR Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
van 't Zelfde, Adrianus J. A. Jacobsstraat 41 2983 XB Ridderkerk / NL | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1997/34] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97102522.6 | 17.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | EP19960200477 | 19.02.1996 Original published format: EP 96200477 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790384 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790384 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/54 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
E06B9/54 (EP);
E06B2009/543 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | Einziehbarer Verschluss | [1997/34] | English: | Retractable closure | [1997/34] | French: | Fermeture rétractable | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.05.2002 | FR | 02.05.2002 | IT | 02.05.2002 | LI | 02.05.2002 | SE | 02.08.2002 | DE | 03.08.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 02.05.2002 | |
FR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
DE | 03.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/47] | CH | 02.05.2002 | |
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
DE | 03.08.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | CH | 02.05.2002 | |
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
DE | 03.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | CH | 02.05.2002 | |
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 02.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2602539 (HAYASHIGUCHI SEIZO) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * claims 1-3 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0489450 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV) [A] 1,2,6-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - line 39 * * column 4, line 13 - line 29 * * column 6, line 12 - line 40 * * figures 1,8 *; | [A]EP0086023 (WESENBEECK CORNELIS MARIA VAN) [A] 1,2,7 * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - line 19 * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [DA]US3149665 (CHARLES DOUGLAS HANDFORD) [DA] 1,6,8 * column 1, line 12 - line 26 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0305081 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV) | [A] - "ADVERTISEMENT", NUOVA FINESTRA, MILAN (IT), (19920601), vol. 13, no. 6, page 169, XP000281243 [A] 1,6,7 * left-hand col. including bottom figures * |