EP0860296 - Process for producing banknotes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINA RESEARCH S.A. Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states FINA RESEARCH S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akkerman, Matthias Anthonie Johannes Oosterstraat 27 3971 AN Driebergen / NL | 02 /
Mulder, Gerhardus Johannis Zeisterweg 29 3984 NH Odijk / NL | [1998/35] | Application number, filing date | 97102773.5 | 20.02.1997 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0860296 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00, D21H19/18, D21H19/20 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
B41M7/0081 (EP);
B41M7/0036 (EP);
B41M7/0045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/19] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Banknoten | [1998/35] | English: | Process for producing banknotes | [1998/35] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de billets de banque | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/51] | 05.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4170681 (EDWARDS JOHN R [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 41 - line 61 * * column 3, line 62 - line 67 * * examples 1,4; claims 1,8,11,12 *; | [X]DE3225875 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 5 - line 20 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 25 ** examples 1-3; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0543385 (DYES JOACHIM LACKFAB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 32 - line 58 * * page 3, line 40 - line 54 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 48 * * examples 1-7; claims 1-9 *; | [X]DE4336214 (SCHWARZ GUENTHER DR [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 3 - line 7 * * page 3, line 53 - line 64 * * examples 1-10; claims 1,2,4,6,8-12 *; | [X]US5384160 (FRAZZITTA JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 6 - line 16 * * column 4, line 64 - column 7, line 49 * * examples 1-3; claims 1,8-11,18,19 * |