EP0796589 - Method and apparatus for automatic configuration of a network node [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. 51, Valley Stream Parkway Malvern, PA 19355-1406 / US | [2003/14] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, New Jersey 08830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Kenneth 126 Woodridge Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Berg, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/28] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/39] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97102814.7 | 20.02.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | US19960618155 | 19.03.1996 Original published format: US 618155 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796589 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796589 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
Y10S128/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur automatischen Konfigurierung eines Netzwerkknotens | [1997/39] | English: | Method and apparatus for automatic configuration of a network node | [1997/39] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la configuration automatique d'un noeud de réseau | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 15.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0553372 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,11-14 * column 11, line 54 - column 15, line 31; tables 1,2 * [A] 6-10; | [PXA]EP0735498 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-7,11,13,14 * column 3, line 3 - line 28 * * column 4, line 4 - column 12, line 26; tables 1-7 * [A] 3,8-10,12; | [PA]EP0735499 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PA] 1,11* column 9, line 48 - column 10, line 12; table 1 * |