EP0791638 - Ink jet recording ink [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Kazuhide c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Kazuaki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 03 /
Takemoto, Kiyohiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 04 /
Miyabayshi, Toshiyuki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97102909.5 | 21.02.1997 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | JP19960035249 | 22.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3524996 | [1997/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0791638 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0791638 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791638 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41J2/01 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US);
B41J2/2107 (EP,US);
B41M3/00 (EP,US);
B41M3/001 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/54 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/35] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungstinten | [1997/35] | English: | Ink jet recording ink | [1997/35] | French: | Encre pour l'enregistrement par jet | [1997/35] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Request for further processing for: | 06.07.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0656406 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 2; claims 1,2,7-10 *; | [A]WO9215648 (BRITISH CERAMIC RES LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5,7 * claims 1,16 * |