EP0793275 - Transistor having main cell and sub-cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states NEC Compound Semiconductor Devices, Ltd. 1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | ||
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohno, Hiroshi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103025.9 | 25.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | JP19960041397 | 28.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4139796 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0793275 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0793275 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793275 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/118, H01L23/66 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H01L24/06 (EP,US);
H01L27/11801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05555 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1305 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13063 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [1997/36] | H01L27/118 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1997/36] | Title | German: | Transistor mit Hauptzellen und Unterzellen | [1997/36] | English: | Transistor having main cell and sub-cells | [1997/36] | French: | Transistor comportant des cellules principales et des cellules secondaires | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4682202 (TANIZAWA TETSU [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column 3, line 8 - line 29; figure 3 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 6; figures 5A,5B,5C * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 30; figures 7A,7B,7C * [A] 3,4; | [XA]EP0494625 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-7 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 37; figures 1,2 * * column 6, line 8 - line 54; figure 4 * * column 7, line 52 - column 8, line 47; figure 7 *[A] 2,4 |