EP0791905 - Paging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohtsuki, Michihito c/o NEC Shizuoka, Ltd., 4-2, Shimomata Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/35] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103032.5 | 25.02.1997 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | JP19960038188 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3818896 | [1997/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791905 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791905 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G08B5/22 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
G08B5/227 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1997/35] | Title | German: | Rufsystem | [1997/35] | English: | Paging system | [1997/35] | French: | Système d'appel | [1997/35] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH04132320 ; | [A]EP0536831 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 6, column 6, line 38 - page 5, column 8, line 50; figures 1-9 *; | [A]GB2263569 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9505646 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 10 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 10 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 15 * * figures 2-7; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5396228 (GARAHI MASOOD [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 27 - line 48 * * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 4 * * figures 1-7; claims 1,2 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920825), vol. 016, no. 401, Database accession no. (E - 1253), & JP04132320 A 19920506 (TOSHIBA CORP) [AD] 1 * abstract * |