EP0791914 - Karaoke apparatus providing customized medley play by connecting plural music pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sone, Takurou, c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103123.2 | 26.02.1997 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | JP19960037913 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3791396 | [1997/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791914 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791914 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
G10H7/008 (EP,US);
G10H1/361 (EP,US);
G10H2210/125 (EP,US);
G10H2240/241 (EP,US);
G10H2240/305 (EP,US);
G10H2250/035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/35] | Title | German: | Karaokevorrichtung mit angepasstem Potpourri erhalten durch das miteinander Verbinden von verschiedenen Musikstücken | [2000/36] | English: | Karaoke apparatus providing customized medley play by connecting plural music pieces | [1997/35] | French: | Dispositif de karaoke fournissant un pot-pourri personnalisé en reliant plusieurs morceaux de musique | [1997/35] |
Former [1997/35] | Karaokevorrichtung mit angepassten Potpourri erhalten durch das miteinander Verbinden von verschiedenen Musikstücken | Examination procedure | 16.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 14.01.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5454723 (HORII KAZUTUGU [JP]) [A] 1,2,9-11 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 34 * * column 3, line 9 - line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]US5486645 (SUH JUNG S [KR], et al) [A] 1,2,9-11 * column 5, line 48 - column 7, line 18; figures 3A-5B *; | [A]US5386081 (NAKADA TAKUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,9-11 * column 2, line 5 - line 20 * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 57; figure 3 *; | [A]US5347082 (OJIMA FUMIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,2,9-11 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 18; claim 16 *; | [A]US5295123 (SERI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 4,6 * column 7, line 59 - column 10, line 9; figure 6 * |