EP0794148 - A device for guiding a telescopic part for a telescopic boom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grove U.S. LLC 1565 Buchanan Trail East Shady Grove Pennsylvania 17256 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Grove U.S. LLC 1565 Buchanan Trail East Shady Grove, Pennsylvania 17256 / US | ||
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states KIDDE INDUSTRIES, INC. 1565 Buchanan Trail East Shady Grove, Pennsylvania 17256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erdmann, Gerd Neusüdender Weg 13f 26125 Oldenburg / DE | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Marx, Lothar Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Marx, Lothar, Dr. Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103128.1 | 26.02.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | DE1996108210 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19608210 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0794148 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0794148 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794148 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/70 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
B66C23/707 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/37] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Führen eines Teleskopteils für einen Teleskopausleger | [1997/37] | English: | A device for guiding a telescopic part for a telescopic boom | [1997/37] | French: | Dispositif pour guider une partie télescopique pour une flèche télescopique | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3101017 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5,13,14 * figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE9308993U (EC ENGINEERING + CONSULTING SPEZIALMASCHINEN) [A] 1-5,13,14 * figures 1,2; claims 1,3-5 *; | [A]DE3042993 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,13,14 * figures 1,2A,2B; claims 1,7 *; | [A]DE4332188 (EILER PETER DR ING [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,13,14 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0202545 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,6,13,14 * figure 3; claim 1 * |