EP0793352 - Apparatus for determining the error evaluator polynomial for use in a Reed-Solomon decoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO., LTD 541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro, Jung-Gu Seoul / KR | [1999/24] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO., LTD 541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro, Jung-Ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Im, Yong-Hee, Daewoo Electronics Co., Ltd. 541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro Jung-Gu, Seoul / KR | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103367.5 | 28.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | KR19960005128 | 28.02.1996 Original published format: KR 9605128 | KR19960005444 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: KR 9605444 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0793352 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0793352 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793352 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
H03M13/151 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung des Fehlerwert-Polynoms zur Verwendung in einem Reed-Solomon Dekodierer | [1997/36] | English: | Apparatus for determining the error evaluator polynomial for use in a Reed-Solomon decoder | [1997/36] | French: | Appareil pour la détermination du polynôme d'évaluation des erreurs dans un décodeur Reed-Solomon | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 27.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.06.1999 | NL | 23.06.1999 | DE | 24.09.1999 | [2008/07] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 23.06.1999 | |
DE | 24.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | DE | 24.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5537426 (LEE DONG H [KR]) [A] 1-6 * column 8, line 4 - line 65; figure 10 * * column A *; | KR940011659B [ ] (GOLD STAR CO [KR]); | KR950001056B [ ] (GOLD STAR CO [KR]); | [A]JPH03190326 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911114), vol. 015, no. 448, Database accession no. (E - 1133), & JP03190326 A 19910820 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |