EP0806312 - Foldable top for convertible vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 D-49084 Osnabrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Tobias Feldblumenweg 33 49086 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Maass, Joachim Kurze Breede 3 49143 Bissendorf / DE | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103396.4 | 01.03.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | DE19961018296 | 07.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19618296 | [1997/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0806312 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0806312 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806312 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/12 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
B60J7/1247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | Faltverdeck für ein Cabriolet-Fahrzeug | [1997/46] | English: | Foldable top for convertible vehicle | [1997/46] | French: | Capote pliante pour véhicule convertible | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 05.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.12.2002 | SE | 04.03.2003 | [2003/43] |
Former [2003/27] | SE | 04.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2327486 (DAIMLER-BENZ) [A] 1 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 31; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE4438253 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) |