EP0798147 - Gear-shift device for an automatic gearbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/18] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states ROLTRA MORSE S.p.A. Zona Industriale, Via Camerelle I-86077 Pozzilli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bravo, Ernesto Via Giacomo Leopardi 3 10020 Cambiano (TO) / IT | [1997/40] | Application number, filing date | 97103793.2 | 07.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00248 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: IT TO960248 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0798147 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0798147 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60K20/02, F16H59/02 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
F16H59/10 (EP,US);
F16H59/0204 (EP,US);
B60K20/02 (EP,US);
F16H2059/0239 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20049 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | Gangschaltgerät für ein automatisches Getriebe | [1997/40] | English: | Gear-shift device for an automatic gearbox | [1997/40] | French: | Dispositif de changement de vitesse pour une boîte de vitesse automatique | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/34] | 30.03.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0307846 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 4 - line 24 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,4; | [X]EP0575658 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 12 * * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 18 * * column 8, line 4 - line 44 ** figures 1,3 * |