EP0797270 - Circuit-breaking terminal particularly for neutral conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conrad, Gerd Mastbruchstrasse 213 A D-33104 Paderborn / DE | For all designated states Hölscher, Heinrich Alderichstrasse 5 D-33098 Paderborn / DE | [1997/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stollburges, Martin Thorenknick 3 33100 Paderborn / DE | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Schirmer, Siegfried, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Schirmer, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Osningstrasse 10 33605 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 97103852.6 | 07.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | DE1996111346 | 22.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19611346 | [1997/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0797270 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0797270 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797270 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
H01R9/2633 (EP);
H01R4/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, IT, LI [1997/39] | Title | German: | Trennklemme, insbesondere für Nulleiter | [1997/39] | English: | Circuit-breaking terminal particularly for neutral conductors | [1997/39] | French: | Borne de coupure notamment pour conducteur neutre | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2248188 (PHOENIX ELEKT) [A] 1,2 * page 5, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1-5 *; | [DA]DE4034204 (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1* column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]EP0702427 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 31; figures 1,2 * [A] |