EP0786903 - Image data processing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Masahiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Noda, Tsugio c/o FUJITSU LTD., 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1999/46] |
Former [1999/35] | 01 /
Fukuda, Masahiro 320 Residence-Shiratori, 1624, Takamori Isehara-shi, Kanagawa, 259-11 / JP | ||
02 /
Noda, Tsugio c/o FUJITSU LTD., 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | |||
Former [1997/31] | 01 /
Sukuda, Masahiro 320 Residence-Shiratori, 1624, Takamori Isehara-shi, Kanagawa, 259-11 / JP | ||
02 /
Noda, Tsugio 101 Haitsu Sunny-Side, 176-1, Ikebata Isehara-shi, Kanagawa, 259-11 / JP | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97103965.6 | 09.08.1991 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | JP19900213379 | 10.08.1990 Original published format: JP 21337990 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0786903 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0786903 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786903 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/30 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
H04N7/54 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
H04N19/112 (EP,US);
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/16 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,US);
H04N19/93 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2000/40] |
Former [1997/31] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Bilddatenverarbeitungsverfahren und -vorrichtung | [1997/31] | English: | Image data processing method and apparatus | [1997/31] | French: | Méthode et appareil de traitement de données d'images | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91307336.7 / EP0470851 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02161887 ; | [PA]JPH02214261 ; | [PA]JPH02274028 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900911), vol. 014, no. 421, Database accession no. (E - 0976), & JP02161887 A 19900621 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - YOSHIYUKI YASHIMA ET AL, "HDTV/STANDARD-TV COMPATIBLE CODING BASED ON DCT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, NEW ORLEANS, MAY 1 - 3, 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19900501), vol. 3 OF 4, pages 1895 - 1898, XP000163579 [A] 1,4,7 * page 1897, column L, line 7, paragraph 3 - line 11; figure 5 * | [A] - DUBOIS ET AL., "Encoding and Progressive Transmission of Still Pictures in NTSC Composite Format using Transform Domain Methods", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, (19860301), vol. COM34, no. 3, pages 310 - 319, XP002038168 [A] 1,4,7 * paragraph [000B] - paragraph [000C]; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1986.1096524 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901113), vol. 014, no. 515, Database accession no. (E - 1000), & JP02214261 A 19900827 (FUJITSU LTD) [PA] 1-20 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910129), vol. 015, no. 036, Database accession no. (E - 1027), & JP02274028 A 19901108 (NEC CORP) [PA] 1-20 * abstract * |