EP0795988 - Method and device for limiting call authorization from communication terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spahl, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Edelweisstrasse 165 82178 Puchheim / DE | 02 /
Lukas, Günter, Ing. Am Sechtlbach 17 2000 Oberzögersdorf / AT | [1997/38] | Application number, filing date | 97104067.0 | 11.03.1997 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | DE1996110287 | 15.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19610287 | [1997/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0795988 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0795988 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/66, H04M3/38 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
H04M3/38 (EP,US);
H04M3/382 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Einschränkung der Wahlberechtigung von Kommunikationsendgeräten | [1997/38] | English: | Method and device for limiting call authorization from communication terminals | [1997/38] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de limitation d'appel à partir de terminaux de communication | [1997/38] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/28] | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.11.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0239503 (GOTTESMAN VICTOR) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 52 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 8 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 24 * [Y] 5; | [X]WO9512266 (MALDES PHOENIX LIMITED [NZ], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 8, line 19 * * page 9, line 22 - line 37 *; | [A]US5454033 (HAHN HARRY B [US], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]US5497411 (PELLERIN JOSEPH C E [CA]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 7, line 25 - column 8, line 2 * |