EP0797054 - Cooling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermosoft Klimatechnik GmbH 64646 Heppenheim / DE | [1997/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nüssle, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Lessingstrasse 29/2 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Michelis & Preissner, Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104081.1 | 11.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | DE1996110518 | 18.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19610518 | [1997/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0797054 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0797054 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797054 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/00, F28F9/22 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
F24F1/0047 (EP,US);
F24F1/0038 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/39] | F24F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1997/39] | Title | German: | Kühlvorrichtung | [1997/39] | English: | Cooling device | [1997/39] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.01.2003 | GB | 22.01.2003 | NL | 22.01.2003 | BE | 31.03.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/28] | GB | 22.01.2003 | |
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 22.01.2003 | |
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 22.01.2003 | |
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 22.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05322207 ; | [A]US2008255 (LARKIN LESTER U) [A] 1-3,5,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2481625 (SARCHET THOMAS H); | [A]DE4016563 (SCHAKO METALLWARENFABRIK [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940311), vol. 018, no. 147, Database accession no. (M - 1575), & JP05322207 A 19931207 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 4,6,9 * abstract * |