EP0801441 - Low insertion pressure connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwahori, Yoshihiro, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1, Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104542.2 | 17.03.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | JP19960076763 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: JP 7676396 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801441 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801441 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
H01R13/62927 (EP,US);
H01R13/62911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/42] | Title | German: | Verbinder mit niedriger Einsteckkraft | [1997/42] | English: | Low insertion pressure connector | [1997/42] | French: | Connecteur électrique à faible force d'insertion | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 30.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06215827 ; | [DA]US4586771 (KRAEMER RUDOLF E [DE], et al) [DA] 1* column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 65; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5183408 (HATAGISHI YUJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0625809 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0631347 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 4, line 39; figures 1-7 *; | [PX]DE19604862 (CINCH CONNECTEURS SA [FR]) [PX] 1,3 * column 1 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941102), vol. 018, no. 573, Database accession no. (E - 1624), & JP06215827 A 19940805 (AMP JAPAN LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * |