EP0797182 - Active matrix LCD with data holding circuit in each pixel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikami, Yoshiro 7-6-403, Oomika-cho 6-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | 02 /
Minemura, Tetsuro 3115-13, Mayumi-cho Hitachioota-shi, Ibaraki 313 / JP | 03 /
Tsumura, Makoto 16-1, Mikanohara-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 04 /
Kuwabara, Kazuhiro 20-1, Higashikanesawa-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 05 /
Komura, Shinichi 33-19, Ishinazaka-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | 06 /
Ohkubo, Tatsuya 1489-1, Tabiko Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 07 /
Sato, Hideo 5-5, Daihara-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 08 /
Hirota, Shoichi 20-17, Minamikouya-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | 09 /
Adachi, Masaya Yuuhou-ryo, 20-3, Ayukawa-cho 6-chome, Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 10 /
Masuda, Kazuhito 19-3-202, Ishinazaka-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104580.2 | 18.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | JP19960062996 | 19.03.1996 Original published format: JP 6299696 | JP19960082340 | 04.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8234096 | JP19960148986 | 11.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14898696 | JP19960156790 | 18.06.1996 Original published format: JP 15679096 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797182 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
G09G3/2011 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
G09G3/3659 (EP,US);
G09G3/3674 (EP,US);
G09G3/3685 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0809 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0814 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0828 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0857 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0876 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
G09G2310/027 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/39] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige mit aktiver Matrix und mit Datenhalteschaltung in jedem Pixel | [1997/39] | English: | Active matrix LCD with data holding circuit in each pixel | [1997/39] | French: | Affichage à cristaux liquides avec matrice active et circuit de maintien de données dans chaque pixel | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 04.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07261155 ; | [XY]EP0414478 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 4; figures 5,7 * [Y] 3-5; | [YA]EP0586155 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 3,5 * column 16, line 7 - column 17, line 33; figures 10,13,14 * * column 19, line 52 - column 21, line 4 * [A] 1 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, & JP07261155 A 19951013 (SONY CORP) [Y] 4 * abstract * |