EP0797268 - Antenna apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kane, Joji 1-4-34, Jingu Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Takashi 3-207-196, Higashiikoma Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-02 / JP | 03 /
Nohara, Akira 10-17, Matsuzonocho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662 / JP | 04 /
Nomura, Noboru 35, Fukakusa-Nakanoshimacho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612 / JP | 05 /
Hasegawa, Makoto 5-22-14-307, Kamisoshigaya, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157 / JP | 06 /
Adachi, Naoki Sato-So 202, 6-29-2, Ikuta, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214 / JP | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104627.1 | 18.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | JP19960062712 | 19.03.1996 Original published format: JP 6271296 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0797268 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0797268 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/29, H01Q1/32, H01Q1/12, H01Q7/00, H01Q21/30 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
H01Q1/32 (EP,US);
H01Q21/29 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/39] | H01Q21/29, H01Q1/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Antennenanordnung | [1997/39] | English: | Antenna apparatus | [1997/39] | French: | Dispositif d'antenne | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/51] | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4072954 (COMASTRI MAURO, et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10,24,32-34 * the whole document * [A] 25,26; | [X]DE3915152 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 22* abstract *; | [XAY]EP0432647 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,15,17,19,20,27,33-35 * abstract * * column 1, line 4 - line 8 * * First Example of Phased Array Antenna * * Rotation of Feed Point Position of Array Antenna * * figures 1,11,14,25,26 * [A] 18,21 [Y] 10,16,28; | [XA]US5266960 (LINDENMEIER HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 17 * column 11, line 12 - line 16 * [A] 18,32; | [XY]EP0590955 (LORAL AEROSPACE CORP [US]) [X] 11 * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 10 * * figures 11,12 * [Y] 10,16,28 |