EP0796663 - Rotary atomiser for electrostatic assisted coating of objects with paints or varnishes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dürr Systems GmbH Otto-Dürr-Strasse 8 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Dürr Systems GmbH Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states Dürr Systems GmbH Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Michael Weinbergsteige 4 74223 Flein / DE | 02 /
Krumma, Harry Karlstrasse 75 74357 Bönnigheim / DE | 03 /
Rupertus, Frank Gottlob-Grotz-Strasse 40 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 04 /
Schneider, Rolf Bergstrasse 27 71576 Burgstetten / DE | 05 /
Vetter, Kurt Rechbergweg 24 71686 Remseck / DE | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104734.5 | 20.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | DE1996111369 | 22.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19611369 | [1997/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0796663 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0796663 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796663 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/04, B05B5/053 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
B05B5/04 (EP);
B05B5/053 (EP);
B05B5/0426 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/39] | B05B5/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Rotationszerstäuber zum elektrostatisch unterstützten Beschichten von Gegenständen mit Farben bzw. Lacken | [1997/39] | English: | Rotary atomiser for electrostatic assisted coating of objects with paints or varnishes | [1997/39] | French: | Pulvérisateur rotatif pour le revêtement assisté par voie électrostatique d'objets par des peintures ou des lacques | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4811906 (PRUS ERIC [FR]) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 64; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0120648 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 13, line 8 - page 15, line 18; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0041008 (MARCHAND BERNARD [FR]) [Y] 1,3,4 * page 9, lines 13-20; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4340441 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 27 - column 7, line 31; figure 1 * | Examination | DE4105116 |