EP0797175 - Electronic game method and apparatus with hierarchy of simulated wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Game Technology 520 South Rock Boulevard Reno Nevada 89502 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states International Game Technology 520 South Rock Boulevard Reno, Nevada 89502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baerlocher, Anthony J. 601 West Adaline Street Carson City, Nevada 89502 / US | 02 /
Crowder, Robert W. Jr. 5380 Twin Creeks Drive Reno, Nevada 89523 / US | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Thul, Stephan, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Thul, Stephan, et al Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104894.7 | 21.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | US19960620586 | 22.03.1996 Original published format: US 620586 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797175 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797175 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
G07F17/3244 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | Elektronisches Spielverfahren und Gerät mit Staffelung von simulierten Walzen | [1997/39] | English: | Electronic game method and apparatus with hierarchy of simulated wheels | [1997/39] | French: | Méthode et machine de jeu électronique avec une hiérarchie de roues simulées | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]GB2086632 (ASS LEISURE GAMES) [X] 9 * page 1, line 89 - line 123; figure . * [A] 10,16,17[Y] 13,14; | [Y]US4711451 (PAJAK PHILLIP [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column A; figures 4-6 *; | [XAY]AU632454B (OLYMPIC AMUSEMENTS) [X] 1-3,7 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, line 10; claim 1; table 1 * [A] 12,15 [Y] 4-6,8; | [Y]US5344144 (CANON JOSEPH W [US]) [Y] 5,6,8,13,14 * column A; figures 1,4 * | Examination | GB2083936 |