EP0798560 - Measuring apparatus and method for its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/40] | Measuring apparatus and method for use of same | ||
[2000/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states Sick AG Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch, Breisgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrmann, Volker, Dr. Zum Fürstenbusch 3 01665 Klipphausen / DE | 02 /
Eschrich, Robert, Dr. Robert-Klett-Ring 1 01796 Pirna / DE | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Finsterwald, Manfred, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Finsterwald, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105158.6 | 26.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | DE1996112706 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19612706 | [1997/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0798560 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0798560 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, G01N1/22 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G01N33/004 (EP);
G01N33/0031 (EP);
G01N33/0006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/40] | G01N33/00, G01N27/12 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/40] | Title | German: | Messvorrichtung sowie Verfahren zu deren Betrieb | [1997/40] | English: | Measuring apparatus and method for its use | [2000/48] | French: | Appareil de mesure et méthode pour son usage | [1997/40] |
Former [1997/40] | Measuring apparatus and method for use of same | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/14] | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5423228 (BUDD ALLAN L ET AL) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 23 - line 32 * * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 25 *; | [A]DD272395 (VEB KRAFTWERKE LÜBBENAU-VETSCHAU) [A] 1-3 * das ganze Dokument *; | [A]GB2107061 (SESTO RES INST BV) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 10 - line 128 *; | [A]US4177787 (YAMAGUCHI HIROAKI ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 24 - line 32 * * column 5, line 27 - line 56; figure 10; claim 1 *; | [A] - DOWNING T M, "PREPARING FOR NEW SMOKESTACK MONITORING REGULATIONS", I & CS - INDUSTRIAL AND PROCESS CONTROL MAGAZINE,US,CHILTON COMPANY. RADNOR, PENNSYLVANIA, (19920201), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 1074-2328, pages 47 - 51, XP000290886 [A] 1-9 * Kapitel "Extractive Systems" und "In Situ Systems" auf den Seiten 47-49 * | [A] - LI N ET AL, "HIGH-TEMPERATURE CARBON MONOXIDE POTENTIOMETRIC SENSOR", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, (19930401), vol. 140, no. 4, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 1068 - 1073, XP000369745 [A] 1,8 * page 1069 * |