EP0799826 - Heteroaryl substituted phenylene derivatives, their preparation and their use as leukotriene receptor antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | 04.12.2009 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOWA CO. LTD. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states KOWA CO. LTD. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 460 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Timmerman, Henk De Sav. Lohmanplantsoen 3 2253 VM Voorschoten / NL | 02 /
Zhang, Mingqiang Turfschip 224 1186 XT Amstelveen / NL | 03 /
Onogi, Kazuhiro 2-7, Ogidai 6-chome Iruma-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Tamura, Masahiro 17-43-104, Noguchicho 2-chome Higashimurayama-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Toma, Tsutomu 14-10, Honcho 2-chome Higasimurayama-shi, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Wada, Yasushi 29-31, Sunagawacho 6-chome Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105279.0 | 27.03.1997 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | JP19960079899 | 02.04.1996 Original published format: JP 7989996 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799826 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/54, C07D215/22, C07D401/12, C07D417/12, C07D403/12, C07D401/14, C07D487/04, C07D215/14, C07D239/74, A61K31/47, A61K31/55, A61K31/505, A61K31/54, A61K31/415, // (C07D487/04, 257:00, 223:00) | [1997/41] | CPC: |
C07D215/227 (EP,US);
C07D215/18 (KR);
C07D215/26 (EP,US);
C07D215/54 (EP,US);
C07D239/74 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | Heteroaryl substituierte Phenylen Derivate, deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung als Leukotrien Rezeptor Antagonisten | [1997/41] | English: | Heteroaryl substituted phenylene derivatives, their preparation and their use as leukotriene receptor antagonists | [1997/41] | French: | Dérivés de phenylene heteroaryle substitués, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme antagonistes de récépteur de leukotriène | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 29.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/01] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8905294 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD [DK]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1,3,5,6 *; | [Y]WO9101123 (RORER INT OVERSEAS [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1,12,13 *; | [Y]WO9106539 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-4,6-8,28,31-34 *; | [Y]WO9119475 (RORER INT HOLDINGS [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1,32,33 *; | [Y]EP0658554 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-5,7,8 *; | [PY]WO9610569 (NIPPON CHEMIPHAR CO [JP], et al) [PY] 1-9* compounds I-1 to I-10 *; page 14 - page 17; claims 1,2 * |