EP0812946 - Method for manufacturing counterweights for washing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/51] | Method for manufacturing counterweights for washing machines and counterweights obtained thereby | ||
[2001/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Zanussi S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo, 3 33170 Pordenone / IT | For all designated states RO-SA PLAST S.p.A. Corso Italia 52 I-33080 Porcia Pordenone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states Electrolux Zanussi S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo, 3 33170 Pordenone / IT | ||
For all designated states RO-SA PLAST S.p.A. Corso Italia 52 I-33080 Porcia, Pordenone / IT | |||
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo 3 33170 Pordenone / IT | ||
For all designated states RO-SA PLAST S.p.A. Corso Italia 52 I-33080 Porcia, Pordenone / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durazzani, Piero Via Lazio 7 33080 Porcia, Pordenone / IT | 02 /
Quattrin, Roberto Via Ponte 37 33080 Murlis di Zoppola, Pordenone / IT | 03 /
Sandrin, Gianni Via Lombardia 3/B 33080 Porcia, Pordenone / IT | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2009/27] |
Former [1997/51] | Giugni, Valter, et al PROPRIA Protezione Proprietà Industriale S.r.L. Via Mazzini 13 33170 Pordenone / IT | Application number, filing date | 97105328.5 | 29.03.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | IT1996PN00038 | 11.06.1996 Original published format: IT PN960038 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0812946 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0812946 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812946 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/26, D06F37/20 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
D06F37/265 (EP);
D06F37/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Gegengewichten für Waschmaschinen | [2001/42] | English: | Method for manufacturing counterweights for washing machines | [2001/42] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de contrepoids pour machines à laver | [2001/42] |
Former [1997/51] | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Gegengewichten für Waschmaschinen und Gegengewichte so hergestellt | ||
Former [1997/51] | Method for manufacturing counterweights for washing machines and counterweights obtained thereby | ||
Former [1997/51] | Procédé de fabrication de contrepoids pour machines à laver et contrepoids ainsi obtenus | Examination procedure | 22.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0515874 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [A] 1,7 * column A; figure - * * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 23 *; | [A]EP0623436 (PESCATORI STEFANO [IT]) [A] 1,7* column A; figure - * |