EP0784948 - Depilatory wax applicator with a retractable roller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Legrain, Marc 3, Lot. Les Cerisiers, Le Gran Logis 01390 Civrieux en Dombes / FR | 02 /
Combe, Daniel Lieu Grelonges 01480 Fareins / FR | [1997/30] | Application number, filing date | 97105500.9 | 14.06.1994 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | FR19930007341 | 14.06.1993 Original published format: FR 9307341 | [1997/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0784948 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0784948 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784948 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A45D26/00, A45D40/26 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
B05C17/00523 (EP,US);
A45D26/0014 (EP,US);
A45D40/261 (EP,US);
B05C17/0357 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/30] | A45D26/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1997/30] | Title | German: | Enthaarungswachsapplikator mit einziehbarer Rolle | [1997/30] | English: | Depilatory wax applicator with a retractable roller | [1997/30] | French: | Applicateur de cire à épiler a rouleau rétractable | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94420171.4 / EP0629366 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0368698 (GARETS CHRISTIAN DES) [DA] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0380391 (RECKITT & COLMANN SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 6-8 *; | [A]GB2187950 (LOUIS MARCEL LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0629366 |