EP0800856 - Catalyst for treating exhaust gases from diesel engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2003/48] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states OMG AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states dmc2 Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60387 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leyrer, Jürgen, Dr. Kieselkaut 1 63796 Kahl/Main / DE | 02 /
Lindner, Dieter, Dr. Fürstenbergstrasse 2 63457 Hanau / DE | 03 /
Lox, Egbert, Dr. Greifenhagenstrasse 12b 63457 Hanau / DE | 04 /
Kreuzer, Thomas P., Dr. Phillipp-Reis-Strasse 13 61184 Karben / DE | 05 /
Müller, Wilfried Rügener Strasse 5 63075 Offenbach / DE | 06 /
Domesle, Rainer, Dr. Rannenbergring 56 63755 Alzenau/Ufr. / DE | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Stellbrink, Axel, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Stellbrink, Axel, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Herrmann, Reinhard OMG AG FI-PAT Postfach 1351 63403 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 97105697.3 | 07.04.1997 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | DE1996114540 | 12.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19614540 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0800856 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0800856 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800856 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J29/12, B01J29/06, B01J21/12 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J29/80 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/92 (KR);
B01J29/068 (EP,US);
B01J29/126 (KR);
B01J29/22 (KR);
B01J29/44 (KR);
B01J35/56 (KR);
B01J2229/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/42] | B01D53/94, B01J29/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | Katalysator zur Reinigung der Abgase von Dieselmotoren | [1997/42] | English: | Catalyst for treating exhaust gases from diesel engines | [1997/42] | French: | Catalysateur pour traitement d'effluents de moteur diesel | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 09.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0559021 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1,7-9 * page 3, line 7 - line 37; examples 2,3,6-11 * [Y] 2-6; | [A]EP0582971 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1,7-9* page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 25; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]DE4239875 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [Y] 2-6 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 11; claims 1-13; table 1 *; | [PX]EP0706817 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [PX] 1,7-9 * page 2, line 49 - line 51; example 33; claims 1-7 *; | [PX]EP0716877 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [PX] 1-3,7-9 * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 24; claims 1-10 * |