EP0805364 - Treatment of glass substrates to compensate for warpage and distortion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beguin, Alain Marcel Jean, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 02 /
Boek, Heather, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 03 /
Maschmeyer, Richard Orr, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 04 /
Trouchet, Denis M. Corning Incorporated, Patent Department SP FR 01-12, Corning, NY 14831 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97105866.4 | 09.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | US19960017001 | 30.04.1996 Original published format: US 17001 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0805364 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/13, G02B6/132, C03B20/00 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
C03B23/0258 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
C03C17/02 (EP,US);
G02B6/13 (EP,US);
G02B6/132 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12038 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IE, IT, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Glassubstraten zur Kompensation von Verbiegung und Verzerrung | [1997/45] | English: | Treatment of glass substrates to compensate for warpage and distortion | [1997/45] | French: | Traitement des substrats en verre pour balancer le voilement et la distorsion | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0304709 (HITACHI LTD [JP])[A] 1,4,8,9,10; | [A]US5261022 (SUN CHENG-KO J [US], et al) [A] 1,4-6,8,9,10; | [A]EP0575157 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,8,9,10; | [A]DE4433738 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4-6,8,9 | [AD] - S. SUZUKI et al., "Polarisa- tion-insensitive arrayed- -waveguide grating multi- plexer with SiO2-on-SiO2 structure", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19940414), vol. 30, no. 8, pages 642 - 643 [AD] 1,4,8,9,10 |