EP0810144 - Front structure for automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stamm, Horst Merowingerstrasse 15 85435 Erding / DE | 02 /
Kahle, Andreas Olgastrasse 3 80636 München / DE | [1997/49] | Application number, filing date | 97105938.1 | 10.04.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | DE1996121673 | 30.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19621673 | [1997/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810144 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810144 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/08 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
B62D25/082 (EP);
B62D25/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/49] | Title | German: | Vorderbau eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1997/49] | English: | Front structure for automotive vehicles | [1997/49] | French: | Structure avant pour véhicules automobiles | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4138395 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 27 - line 34; figure 2 *; | [A]US2851302 (OWEN ROBERT E) [A] 1 * column 2, line 33 - line 59; figure 4 *; | [A]FR2392863 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 2 - line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3188132 (WILLI SCHWIERING, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |