EP0803524 - Polyurethane powder coating not releasing any decomposition products and having a low baking temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/44] | Pulverulent polyurethane lacquer not releasing any decomposition products and having a lower baking temperature | ||
[2003/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1997/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laas, Hans-Josef, Dr. Namibiastrasse 34 50733 Köln / DE | 02 /
Meier-Westhues, Hans-Ulrich, Dr. Am Rosenhügel 10 51379 Leverkussen / DE | 03 /
Halpaap, Reinhard, Dr.r. In der Hildscheid 6 51519 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
Freudenberg, Ulrich, Dr. Hahnenstrasse 85 50259 Pulheim / DE | 05 /
Klee, Hans-Peter, Dipl.-Ing Blasberg 5 B 51399 Burscheid / DE | [1997/44] | Application number, filing date | 97106063.7 | 14.04.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | DE1996116496 | 25.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19616496 | [1997/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803524 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803524 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, C08G18/20, C08G18/42, C09D175/04, C09D5/03, C08G18/18 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
C08G18/798 (EP,US);
C08G18/1858 (EP,US);
C08G18/2063 (EP,US);
C08G18/4219 (EP,US);
C08G18/8016 (EP);
C08G2150/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/44] | Title | German: | Abspalterfreier Polyurethan-Pulverlack mit niedriger Einbrenntemperatur | [1997/44] | English: | Polyurethane powder coating not releasing any decomposition products and having a low baking temperature | [2003/18] | French: | Vernis de polyuréthane pulvérulent ne relâchant pas de produits de décomposition et ayant une température basse de cuisson au four | [1997/44] |
Former [1997/44] | Pulverulent polyurethane lacquer not releasing any decomposition products and having a lower baking temperature | Examination procedure | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 14.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 30.04.2004 | [2005/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1542058 (SAN ABBOTT LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 2 ** page 3, column R, paragraph 2 *; | [A]FR2391235 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 28 - page 8, line 9 * * table 1 * |