EP0803883 - Converter transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honma, Tooru 108 Winbel Corlus Funabashi 1381-1, Kaijin-cho-minami 1-chome Funabashi-shi, Chiba / JP | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, Dr., et al Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106164.3 | 15.04.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | JP19960130831 | 27.04.1996 Original published format: JP 13083196 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803883 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803883 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/42 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
H01F38/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1997/44] | Title | German: | Wandlertransformator | [1997/44] | English: | Converter transformer | [1997/44] | French: | Transformateur de convertisseur | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 08.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0071008 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2 * |