EP0802245 - Coating composition, printing medium and image forming process using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Hiromichi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Higuma, Masahiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sato, Yuko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/43] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106173.4 | 15.04.1997 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | JP19960094058 | 16.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9405896 | JP19970039048 | 24.02.1997 Original published format: JP 3904897 | JP19970080194 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8019497 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802245 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802245 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/12, B41M5/00, B41J2/01 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (KR);
C09D7/65 (EP,US);
C09D7/68 (EP,US);
C09D7/69 (EP,US);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31696 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/43] | Title | German: | Überzugzusammensetzung, Druckmedium und Bildherstellungsverfahren unter Verwendung desselben | [2000/44] | English: | Coating composition, printing medium and image forming process using the same | [1997/43] | French: | Composition de revêtement, support d'impression et procédé de formation d'images en faisant utilisation | [1997/43] |
Former [1997/43] | Überzugszusammensetzung, Druckmedium und Bildherstellungsverfahren unter Verwendung desselben | Examination procedure | 09.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 10.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.12.2001 | CH | 05.12.2001 | IT | 05.12.2001 | LI | 05.12.2001 | NL | 05.12.2001 | [2008/07] |
Former [2003/06] | BE | 05.12.2001 | |
CH | 05.12.2001 | ||
LI | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 05.12.2001 | |
LI | 05.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU448472 (DULUX AUSTRALIA) [A] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 9, bottom *; page 10, paragraph 3 *; | [A]US4517244 (KOBAYASHI MASATSUNE [JP], et al)[A] 1-42; | [A]EP0350257 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 15-42; | [X]EP0383273 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,13,14 * page 3, lines 26-41; claim 1 * * page 4, lines 11-12 * * page 4, lines 24-26 *; | [D]JPH02223466 (CANON KK); | [X]EP0416762 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,13,14 * page 4, lines 20-37 * |