EP0802688 - Apparatus for recording and reproducing digital image and speech [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Hisashi 18-7-301, Midorigaoka Kashiwa-shi / JP | 02 /
Nagayama, Keiji 5-1-101, Katsutanakaharacho Hitachinaka-shi / JP | 03 /
Yatsugi, Tomishige 2901-20, Katsukura Hitachinaka-shi / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/43] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106198.1 | 15.04.1997 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | JP19960095498 | 17.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9549896 | JP19970032200 | 17.02.1997 Original published format: JP 3220097 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0802688 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0802688 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802688 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/804, H04N5/77 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
H04N1/00442 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N1/212 (EP,US);
H04N1/2125 (EP,US);
H04N1/215 (EP,US);
H04N1/2158 (EP,US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N23/951 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
H04N5/772 (EP,US);
H04N9/8045 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/61 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/214 (EP,US);
H04N2201/218 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3214 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3215 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3243 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3252 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3264 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3273 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3295 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/43] | H04N9/804 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme und Wiedergabe von digitalem Bild und Ton | [1997/43] | English: | Apparatus for recording and reproducing digital image and speech | [1997/43] | French: | Dispositif pour enregistrer et reproduire des images et du son numériques | [1997/43] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05013345.3 / EP1575308 | EP10011249.9 / EP2326095 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4982291 (KURAHASHI SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,11,16-18 * column W *; | [A]US5130813 (OIE MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,11,16-18 * column W *; | [A]US5130860 (NAGASHIMA YOSHITAKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,17,18 * column 9, line 56 - column 13, line 16; figures 13,14 *; | [A]US5459582 (TAKAHASHI KOJI [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,13,17,18* column W * | Examination | EP0642274 | EP0678819 | - TONOMURA Y. ET AL, "CONTENT ORIENTED VISUAL INTERFACE USING VIDEO ICONS FOR VISUAL DATABASE SYSTEMS", JOURNAL OF VISUAL LANGUAGES AND COMPUTING,LONDON, (199001), vol. 1, pages 183 - 198, XP000195706 |