EP0802675 - Double window display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hisakatsu, Itoh c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Yoshihiko, Ogawa c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Kazuhiko, Muguruma c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106301.1 | 16.04.1997 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | JP19960097033 | 18.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9703396 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0802675 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0802675 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/45 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
H04N7/0122 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (KR);
H04N5/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/43] | Title | German: | Doppelfensteranzeigegerät | [1997/43] | English: | Double window display apparatus | [1997/43] | French: | Appareil d'affichage à double fenêtre | [1997/43] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 06.07.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9119395 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5025315 (JOHARY ARUN [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5363143 (DUFFIELD DAVID J [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5283651 (ISHIZUKA SHIGEKI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0660601 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |