EP0803601 - Process for making a permeable fibrous structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/44] | High performance, permeable fibrous structure | ||
[2001/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AQF Technologies LLC 13319-A Carowinds Blvd. Charlotte, NC 28273 / US | [1999/36] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groeger, Gunter H. 7716 Bradenton Drive Charlotte, NC 28210 / US | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Reitzner, Bruno, et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106428.2 | 18.04.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | US19960636102 | 22.04.1996 Original published format: US 636102 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803601 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803601 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/54, B01D39/08 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
B01D39/083 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2239/0233 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2239/0407 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2239/0471 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2239/0622 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2239/065 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2239/0668 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2239/069 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer permeablen Faserstruktur | [2001/36] | English: | Process for making a permeable fibrous structure | [2001/36] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une structure fibreuse perméable | [2001/36] |
Former [1997/44] | Permeable Hochleistungsfaserstruktur | ||
Former [1997/44] | High performance, permeable fibrous structure | ||
Former [1997/44] | Structure fibreuse perméable de haute performance | Examination procedure | 12.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 27.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.05.1997 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   18.07.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.07.2002 | CH | 17.07.2002 | FR | 17.07.2002 | LI | 17.07.2002 | SE | 17.10.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 17.07.2002 | |
CH | 17.07.2002 | ||
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 17.07.2002 | |
CH | 17.07.2002 | ||
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | CH | 17.07.2002 | |
LI | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 17.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3971373 (BRAUN DAVID L) [A] 1,5* column 4, line 31 - column 7, line 30 *; | [A]EP0582286 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,5,7 * page 3, line 45 - page 7, line 52 *; | [AD]US5328758 (MARKELL CRAIG G [US], et al) [AD] 1,5 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 35 *; | [AD]US5486410 (GROEGER H GUNTER [US], et al) [AD] 1,2,4,5 * whole document * |