EP0864875 - Method for testing a safety circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC GMBH Gothaer Strasse 29 40880 Ratingen / DE | [1998/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auger, Marc 3, allée James Cook 16800 Soyaux / FR | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [1998/42] | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel, Dipl.-Ing. Rondorfer Strasse 5a 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106504.0 | 19.04.1997 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | DE1971904039 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: DE 97104039 | [1998/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0864875 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0864875 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0864875 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/327, G01R31/02, G05B19/042 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
G01R31/3275 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/38] | G01R31/327, G01R31/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/47] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überprüfung einer Sicherheitsschaltung | [1998/38] | English: | Method for testing a safety circuit | [1998/38] | French: | Procédé pour tester un circuit de sécurité | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 16.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.08.2003 | [2006/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4627056 (KOBAYASHI SATOSHI ET AL) [X] 1,11,12 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 5 - line 12 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 44 * * column 5, line 1 - line 6 * * column 6, line 26 - line 61 * * column 10, line 31 - column 11, line 49 *; | [XAY]EP0418665 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,4,8 * abstract * * page 4, line 35 - line 55 * * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 8 * * page 7, line 24 - line 56 * * figures 2-4,6 * [A] 3,6,9,10 [Y] 2,5,7; | [YA]US4275464 (SCHMIDT DAVID J) [Y] 2,7 * abstract * * figure 1B * * column 6, line 50 - line 63 * * column 20, line 4 - line 63 * [A] 9,10; | [Y]US4390920 (LAU WALDEMAR) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 4, line 49 - line 63 *; | [XP]EP0762246 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [XP] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 8 * * column 3, line 5 - line 22 * * column 3, line 46 - line 54 * * column 4, line 21 - line 44 * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]WO9217829 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI) [A] 1,5-7,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - line 38 * * page 4, line 28 - page 6, line 11 * * figures 1,2A,3 * |