EP0803546 - Hydroxygallium phthalocyanine compound, production process therefor and electrophotographic photosensitive member using the compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Masato Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97106946.3 | 25.04.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | JP19960129288 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: JP 12928896 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803546 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803546 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/50, C07F5/00, G03G5/06 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
C07F5/003 (EP,US);
C09B47/18 (KR);
C09B67/0003 (EP,US);
C09B67/0026 (EP,US);
G03G5/0696 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/44] | Title | German: | Hydroxygalliumphthalocyaninverbindung, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und elektrographisches lichtempfindliches Element unter Verwendung dieser Verbindung | [1997/44] | English: | Hydroxygallium phthalocyanine compound, production process therefor and electrophotographic photosensitive member using the compound | [1997/44] | French: | Composé de phtalocyanine d'hydroxygallium, son procédé de fabrication et élément photosensible électrophotographique utilisant ce composé | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 11.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00123659.5 / EP1081555 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5407766 (MAYO JAMES D [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,6; | [A]EP0655655 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 3,7,8; | [A]US5459004 (DAIMON KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3; | [A]EP0617091 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3; | [A]US5384625 (ANAYAMA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,7; | [A]US5463043 (NUKADA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,6 |