EP0809962 - Handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Dingerkus GmbH & Co. KG Finnentroper Strasse 26 57439 Attendorn / DE | [1997/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamers, Heinz-Günter Zum Ziegenberg 42 57439 Attendorn / DE | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107065.1 | 29.04.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | DE1996121524 | 29.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19621524 | DE1996153228 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19653228 | [1997/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809962 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809962 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47J45/06 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
A47J45/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IT [1997/49] | Title | German: | Stielgriff | [1997/49] | English: | Handle | [1997/49] | French: | Poignée à manche | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 11.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.09.1999 | DK | 29.12.1999 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/46] | DK | 29.12.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1490568 (REMUS KOENIG); | [A]US3838680 (SHIPMAN P) [A] 1 * column 3, line 9 - line 25; figure 5 *; | [A]GB2086981 (SCHROFF GMBH) [A] 4,5 * abstract *; | [A]GB2171450 (DART IND INC) [A] 4,5 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0247229 (NITTO ALUMINIUM MFG [JP]) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * |