EP0806690 - Rotating device and light beam deflecting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Masao Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shibuya, Satoshi Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kamimura, Naoji Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107123.8 | 30.04.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | JP19960114756 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11475696 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0806690 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0806690 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806690 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/10, G02B26/12, F16C17/10 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
G02B26/121 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/46] | G02B26/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/46] | Title | German: | Drehvorrichtung und Lichtstrahl-Ablenkungsgerät | [1997/46] | English: | Rotating device and light beam deflecting apparatus | [1997/46] | French: | Dispositif de rotation et appareil de déviation d'un faisceau lumineux | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.08.2003 | IT | 06.08.2003 | NL | 06.08.2003 | DE | 07.11.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 06.08.2003 | |
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
DE | 07.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | NL | 06.08.2003 | |
DE | 07.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 06.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0558092 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 15, line 17 - column 23, line 50; figures 1-6,14 *; | [A]US5114245 (TANAKA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 54 - column 6, line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19510593 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0433483 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 7, line 44 - column 9, line 32 * * column 11, line 56 - column 12, line 31; figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [A]US4958098 (SARRAF SANWAL P [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-4 * |