EP0805072 - Gasgenerator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Airbag Systems GmbH & Co. KG Wernher-von-Braun-Strasse 1 84544 Aschau am Inn / DE | [1998/05] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states TEMIC Bayern-Chemie Airbag GmbH Wernher-von-Braun-Strasse 1 D-84544 Aschau/Inn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Hermann Friedrich-Pfennig-Strasse 41 89518 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
Fürst, Franz Leharstrasse 7 85098 Grossmehring / DE | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107182.4 | 30.04.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | DE1996118040 | 04.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19618040 | [1997/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0805072 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0805072 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805072 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/26 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
B60R21/2644 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | Gasgenerator | [1997/45] | English: | Gasgenerator | [1997/45] | French: | Générateur de gaz | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.03.2002 | IT | 06.03.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/04] | GB | 06.03.2002 | |
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 06.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0546791 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [A] 1 * figure - * * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 29 *; | [A]EP0444252 (BAYERN CHEMIE GMBH FLUGCHEMIE [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 42 *; | [A]EP0582861 (NIPPON KOKI KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 7 * * abstract *; | [A]JPH07237518 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP07237518 A 19950912 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |