EP0807558 - Releasing method for passive safety devices in vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATMEL Germany GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [2000/50] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states TEMIC Semiconductor GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | ||
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchheim, Timm Komberger Weg 87 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Gerhard, Dr. Walter-Koch-Strasse 19 74189 Weinsberg / DE | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, et al Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, FTP/H, Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, FTP/H, Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | ||
Former [1997/47] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107333.3 | 03.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | DE1996119414 | 14.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19619414 | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807558 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807558 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/32, B60R22/46, B60R21/13 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
B60R21/0133 (EP,US);
B60R21/0132 (EP,US);
G01P15/18 (EP,US);
G01P21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/47] | Title | German: | Auslöseverfahren für passive Sicherheitseinrichtungen in Fahrzeugen | [1997/47] | English: | Releasing method for passive safety devices in vehicles | [1997/47] | French: | Procédé de déclenchement d'un système de sécurité passif dans un véhicule | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2123359 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0311039 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]DE3816588 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO9009298 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 8 * claim 11 *; | [A]EP0517253 (KANSEI KK [JP]) [A] * column 10, line 19 - column 11, line 16 *; | [A]WO9309008 (PINEROLI BRUNO [CH]) [A] 1,2,4,9 * abstract *; | [A]DE4424551 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [A] 1,2,4,9-11,13,14 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE19537546 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [PA] 1,2,4,9,11 * the whole document * |