EP0807764 - Bellow of thermoplastic or elastomeric material for the covering joints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN Automotive AG Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states GKN Automotive AG Hauptstrasse 150 D-53797 Lohmar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konegen, Herbert Pestalozziweg 6 51503 Rösrath / DE | 02 /
Schreiber, Hans Schulstrasse 49 66333 Völklingen-Ludweiler / DE | 03 /
Schafferus, Thomas Narzissenstrasse 1 47495 Rheinberg / DE | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97107429.9 | 06.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | DE1996119368 | 14.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19619368 | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807764 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/84, F16J3/04 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
F16D3/845 (EP);
F16J3/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/47] | Title | German: | Faltenbalg aus thermoplastischem oder elastomerem Material zur Abdeckung von Gelenken | [1997/47] | English: | Bellow of thermoplastic or elastomeric material for the covering joints | [1997/47] | French: | Soufflet en matière thermoplastique ou elastomère pour le recouvrement des articulations | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 04.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2000/18] | 30.09.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE4301062 (GKN AUTOMOTIVE AG [DE]) [DY] 1,2,11,12 * column 2, line 1 - line 49; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]JPS63120748 ; | [DA]DE3936640 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1,2,11,12 * claims 4-7 *; | [A]EP0315363 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 50 - page 5, line 56 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881005), vol. 12, no. 372, Database accession no. (C - 533), & JP63120748 A 19880525 (NOK CORP) [Y] 1,2,11,12 * abstract * |