EP0807648 - Latent curing aqueous polyurethane dispersions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Licht, Ulrike, Dr. Hermsheimer Strasse 72 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Kokel, Nicolas, Dr. Budapester Strasse 45 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Häberle, Karl, Dr. Allerheiligenstrasse 15 67346 Speyer / DE | 04 /
Angel, Maximilian, Dr. Bayernstrasse 12 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 05 /
Weyland, Peter, Dr. Ludwigshafener Strasse 12a 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 06 /
Scherr, Günter, Dr. An der Mittagsweide 17 67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1997/47] | Application number, filing date | 97107492.7 | 07.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | DE1996119636 | 15.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19619636 | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807648 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807648 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807648 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/67, C09D175/14 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
C09D175/14 (EP,US);
C08J3/03 (KR);
C08G18/67 (EP,US);
C08G18/6705 (EP,US);
C08G18/672 (EP,US);
C08G18/6725 (EP,US);
C08K5/17 (KR);
C09J175/14 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (KR);
C08L2201/54 (KR);
C08L2205/02 (KR);
C08L2666/20 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/672, C08G18/0823 (US,EP);
C08G18/67, C08G18/0804 (EP,US);
C09D175/14, C08L2666/20 (US,EP);
C09J175/14, C08L2666/20 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1997/47] | C08G18/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/47] | Title | German: | Latent vernetzende wässerige Polyurethandispersionen | [1997/47] | English: | Latent curing aqueous polyurethane dispersions | [1997/47] | French: | Dispersions aqueuses de polyuréthane de réticulation latent | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 14.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0183119 (RESEM SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1-10 * in der Anmeldung erwähnt *; | [A]EP0184302 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 26 - column 4, line 55 ** claims 1,5,6 *; | [AD]EP0443537 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-10 * in der Anmeldung erwähnt *; | [A]US5306764 (CHEN DER-SHYANG [TW]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 42 * * claims 1,4-7,11-13 *; | [A]EP0704469 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [XP]EP0794204 (BASF AG [DE]) [XP] 1-10 * column 15, line 3 - column 15, line 50 * * claims 1,6 * |