EP0808838 - Sulfur-containing heterocyclic bradykinin antagonists, processes for their production and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2003/43] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Adalbert, Dr. Hans-Fischer-Strasse 4 86368 Gersthofen / DE | 02 /
Heitsch, Holger, Dr. Castellumstrasse 52 55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE | 03 /
Nölken, Gerhard, Dr. Starkeradweg 15 65843 Sulzbach / DE | 04 /
Wirth, Klaus, Dr. Robert-Schumann-Ring 104 65830 Kriftel / DE | 05 /
Schölkens, Bernward, Prof. Dr. Hölderlinstrasse 62 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [1997/48] | Application number, filing date | 97107623.7 | 09.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | DE1996120508 | 22.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19620508 | [1997/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808838 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808838 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/62, C07D417/12, A61K31/41 | [1997/48] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/48] | Extension states | SI | 09.06.1997 | Title | German: | Schwefel enthaltende heterocyclische Bradykinin-Antagonisten, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1997/48] | English: | Sulfur-containing heterocyclic bradykinin antagonists, processes for their production and use thereof | [1997/48] | French: | Antagonistes de bradykinine soufrés, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.10.2003 | IE | 22.10.2003 | DK | 22.01.2004 | GR | 22.01.2004 | SE | 22.01.2004 | PT | 22.03.2004 | AT | 09.05.2004 | LU | 09.05.2004 | BE | 31.05.2004 | CH | 31.05.2004 | LI | 31.05.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/51] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
AT | 09.05.2004 | ||
LU | 09.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
CH | 31.05.2004 | ||
LI | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
LU | 09.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
CH | 31.05.2004 | ||
LI | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
LU | 09.05.2004 | ||
CH | 31.05.2004 | ||
LI | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.05.2004 | ||
LI | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 22.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0299457 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-7 *; | [Y]US4863923 (HO PETER P K [US], et al) [Y] 1-6* claims 1-14 *; | [Y]EP0596406 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-6,8-11 *; | [Y]WO9506469 (CANCER RES CAMPAIGN TECH [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-20 *; | [Y]EP0707852 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-5 *; | [Y]WO9612491 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]WO9613485 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-10 * |