EP0808967 - Rail fence or enclosure in general highly easy to produce and install [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ditta Braccio, Enrico Via Garibaldi, 53 27020 Cergnago (Pavia) / IT | [1997/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97108060.1 | 16.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI01008 | 20.05.1996 Original published format: IT MI961008 | [1997/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808967 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0808967 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808967 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04H17/14 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
E04H17/1439 (EP,US);
E04H17/1447 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, SE [1997/48] | Extension states | SI | 04.06.1997 | Title | German: | Zaun oder Umschliessung, die leicht herzustellen und zu montieren ist | [1997/48] | English: | Rail fence or enclosure in general highly easy to produce and install | [1997/48] | French: | Clôture ou enceinte pouvant être produite et installée facilement | [2000/27] |
Former [1997/48] | Clôture ou enceinte pouvant être produite et installé facilement | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 06.04.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.07.2000 | LI | 05.07.2000 | SE | 05.10.2000 | [2002/02] |
Former [2001/27] | SE | 05.10.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2218953 (GUSTAFSON GUSTAF A) [X] 1,2,8,10 * page 1, column R, line 7 - line 12 * * page 1, column R, line 19 - line 33; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-7,9; | [Y]GB1233304 (C. & C. MARSHALL LIMITED) [Y] 6,7 * page 1, line 28 - line 78; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2206771 (DIVERSEY FRANCE [FR]) [A] 4,9* figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US4667935 (MOORE ROBERT S [US]) [Y] 4 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0583611 (RABUFFETTI EZIO RABUFFETTI ANG [IT]) [Y] 3,5 * column 2, line 45 - line 53; figures 2,4,7,13 *; | [Y]GB2269837 (BAILEY WILLIAM [AU]) [Y] 9 * page 12, line 37 - page 13, line 20; figure 17 * |