EP0807435 - Indirect HMG-CoA-reductase inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sertürner Arzneimittel GmbH Stadtring Nordhorn 113 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [1997/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gebhardt, R., Prof.Dr., Eberhard-Karls-Uni.Tübingen Phys.-Chemisches Institut, Hoppe-Seyler-Strasse 4 72076 Tübingen / DE | [1999/17] |
Former [1999/15] | 01 /
Gebhardt, R., Prof.Dr., Eberhard-Karls-Uni.Tübingen Phys.-Chemisches Ins., Hoppe-Seyler-Strasse 4 72076 Tübingen / DE | ||
Former [1997/47] | 01 /
Gebhardt, R., Prof.-Dr. Eberhard-Karls-Uni.Tübingen Phys.-Chemisches Ins., Hoppe-Seyler-Strasse 4 72076 Tübingen / DE | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108124.5 | 20.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | DE1996120001 | 17.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19620001 | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807435 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807435 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K31/35 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/7048 (EP);
A61K31/352 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/47] | Extension states | AL | 13.06.1997 | LT | 13.06.1997 | LV | 13.06.1997 | RO | 13.06.1997 | SI | 13.06.1997 | Title | German: | Indirekter HMG-CoA-Reduktase-Hemmer | [1997/47] | English: | Indirect HMG-CoA-reductase inhibitor | [1997/47] | French: | Inhibiteur indirect de la réductase HMG-CoA | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/07] | 07.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/18] | 10.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0375156 (MERCK & CO. INC.) [A] 1-7; | [A]WO9513063 (MERCK & CO., INC.) [A] 1-7 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [X] 1-7 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index [X] 1-7 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, XP002900220 [X] 1-7 |