EP0810480 - Electrophotograpic photosensitive member, and apparatus and process cartridge provided with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitamura, Wataru Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hirano, Hidetoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yoshimura, Kimihiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108476.9 | 26.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | JP19960132459 | 27.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13245996 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0810480 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0810480 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810480 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/05, G03G5/06 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
G03G5/0564 (EP,US);
G03G5/06142 (EP,US);
G03G5/06144 (EP,US);
G03G5/06147 (EP,US);
G03G5/0668 (EP,US);
G03G5/14756 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/49] | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches, lichtempfindliches Element, sowie Geräte und Prozesskassetten die es umfassen | [1997/49] | English: | Electrophotograpic photosensitive member, and apparatus and process cartridge provided with the same | [1997/49] | French: | Elément photosensible électrophotographique, appareil et cartouche de traitement le comprenant | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0608562 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 9 - page 10; examples 1,10 *; | [A]EP0504794 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 47; example 1 *; | [A]US5332635 (TANAKA HISAMI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 6 - column 8 * * column 10; figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP0645680 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 19; example 3 * |