EP0810145 - A wheel-arch cover panel for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAN VALERIANO S.p.A. Strada Prov.le Carignano-Virle Km. 5,700 10060 Virle Piemonte (Torino) / IT | [2002/40] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states SAN VALERIANO S.P.A. Str. Prov. Carignano-Virle Km. 5,700 I-10060 Virle Piemonte / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchisio, Enzo Via Rodi 12 10064 Pinerolo (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Tasca, Maurizio Strada delle Terrazze 56/12 10133 Torino / IT | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97108508.9 | 27.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00114U | 27.05.1996 Original published format: IT TO960114 U | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810145 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810145 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/16 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
B62D25/161 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23979 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1997/49] | Title | German: | Innerer Schutzdeckel für den Kotflügel eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1997/49] | English: | A wheel-arch cover panel for a motor vehicle | [1997/49] | French: | Panneau de couverture de garde-boue d'un véhicule automobile | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 26.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0222193 (FORD WERKE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * page 4, paragraph L; figure 4 *; | [Y]US4555380 (MUNAKATA SHUNSAKU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 37 - line 62 *; | [A]WO9419228 (WRIGHT RUBBER GROUP PTY LIMITE [AU], et al) [A] 3 * page 7, paragraph L; figures 3-5 *; | [A]DE4240935 (KLAUS KUNSTSTOFFTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,4 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 19; figure 4 *; | [A]DE29508736U (BORGERS JOHANN GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 1; figure 3 *; | [A]DE29517047U (BORGERS JOHANN GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 11 - line 15 * * page 2, line 29 - line 32; figure 3 *; | [A]JPH01165424 ; | [A]EP0262092 (MATEC HOLDING [CH]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 22 - line 52; figure 3 *; | [A]US5153388 (WITTENMAYER KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 60; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890927), vol. 013, no. 432, Database accession no. (M - 874), & JP01165424 A 19890629 (NISHIKAWA KASEI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |