EP0810229 - Process for preparing methylchlorosilanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [1997/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Straussberger, Herbert Heidegasse 4 84561 Mehring/Öd / DE | 02 /
Pachaly, Bernd, Dr. Utzenstrasse 1 84561 Mehring/Öd / DE | 03 /
Streckel, Willi Neuhauser Strasse 8 84561 Mehring/Öd / DE | 04 /
Reindl, Markus Unghauser Strasse 23 84489 Burghausen / DE | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Fritz, Helmut, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung Patente, Marken und Lizenzen, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108702.8 | 30.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | DE1996121795 | 30.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19621795 | [1997/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810229 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810229 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/16 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
C07F7/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Methylchlorsilanen | [1997/49] | English: | Process for preparing methylchlorosilanes | [1997/49] | French: | Procédé de préparation de méthylchlorosilanes | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 30.05.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2001
06.09.2001
ADMISSIBLE GE Bayer Silicones GmbH & Co. KG Legal Department, Building V7 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2001
06.09.2001
ADMISSIBLE GE Bayer Silicones GmbH & Co. KG Legal Department, Building V7 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.08.2001
06.09.2001
ADMISSIBLE GE Bayer Silicones GmbH & Co. KG Falkenberg 1 D - 40699 Erkrath / DE Opponent's representative Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 25.09.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.09.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.11.2000 | GB | 22.11.2000 | NL | 22.11.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/09] | GB | 22.11.2000 | |
NL | 22.11.2000 | ||
FR | 20.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | GB | 22.11.2000 | |
FR | 20.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | FR | 20.04.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2933342 (BAYER AG) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2398020 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US5239102 (WEBB STEVEN W [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column W *; | [X]US5243061 (WEBB STEVEN W [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column W *; | [DA]EP0440414 (ELKEM METALS [US]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document * | Examination | US4281149 |