EP0810345 - Sealing profile for a door leaf [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÖRMANN KG DISSEN Industriestrasse 1 Gewerbepark Süd 49201 Dissen a.T.W. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states HÖRMANN KG DISSEN Industriestrasse 1 Gewerbepark Süd D-49201 Dissen a.T.W. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörmann, Stephan; Dipl.-Phys. Virchowstrasse 28 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Flügel, Otto Flügel Preissner Kastel, Postfach 81 05 06 81905 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser & Flügel, Postfach 81 05 06 81905 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108714.3 | 30.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | DE1996121742 | 30.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19621742 | [1997/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0810345 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0810345 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/23, E06B9/17 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
E06B7/2316 (EP);
E06B9/17046 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/49] | E06B7/23 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/14] |
Former [1997/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Torblatt-Dichtungsprofil | [1997/49] | English: | Sealing profile for a door leaf | [1997/49] | French: | Profilé d'étanchéité pour un panneau de porte | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, LU, MC | 18.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/27] | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.08.1997 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.10.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4055917 (COLLER) [X] 1 * column 5, line 8 - column 5, line 30; figures 7,8 *; | [X]US4447989 (MAILAND ET AL.) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4356856 (BENGTSSON) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0497134 (HÖRMANN KG) [A] 1,4 * the whole document * |