EP0811766 - Displacement type vacuum pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagisawa, Kiyoshi 2-5-18-205 Miyamaedaira, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Matake, Kozo 1-2-117, Kyomachi 3-chome, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ojima, Yoshinori 4-258-1-602 Tamanawa Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Hisabe, Yasushi 15-14-206, Ichinomiya 4-chome, Sumukawa-machi Kohza-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/50] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108724.2 | 30.05.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | JP19960162401 | 03.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16240196 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0811766 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0811766 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811766 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0811766 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04C23/00, F04C18/16 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
F04C23/001 (EP,KR,US);
F04C18/16 (EP,KR,US);
F04C29/0085 (EP,KR,US);
F04C2220/12 (EP,KR,US);
F04C2240/51 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/50] | Title | German: | Verdrängungsvakuumpumpe | [1997/50] | English: | Displacement type vacuum pump | [1997/50] | French: | Pompe de déplacement positif à vide | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2963884 (AF ROSENSCHOLD JOHN RUTGER MUN, et al) [X] 1,3,7,10 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 12; figure - * [Y] 8; | [Y]WO9310355 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8 * see abstract;; figure 7 *; | [A]FR1006777 (PILLARD) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 7 - line 19; figure 5 * * page 2, column R, line 14 - line 22; figure 9 *; | [A]EP0678966 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5,9 * column 1, line 5 - line 17 * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 51 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 44; figures 1-3 * * column 11, line 38 - column 16, line 19; figures 15-22 * |