EP0811755 - Exhaust gas purifying method and apparatus for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Hiroshi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Itou, Takaaki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97108758.0 | 02.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | JP19960140501 | 03.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14050196 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811755 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811755 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F02M25/07 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N3/0835 (EP,US);
F01N3/0878 (EP,US);
F02M26/15 (EP,US);
F02M26/53 (EP,US);
F01N2240/18 (EP,US);
F01N2250/12 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
F02M26/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/34] |
Former [1997/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Abgasreinigung für Brennkraftmaschine | [1997/50] | English: | Exhaust gas purifying method and apparatus for internal combustion engine | [1997/50] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de purification de gaz d'échappement pour moteur à combustion interne | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 19.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH05171929 ; | [YA]US5388405 (FUJISHITA MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,5 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 26 * * column 11, line 65 - column 13, line 20; figures 5,6 * [A] 2; | [A]JPH05231134 ; | [A]EP0593898 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 9, line 51 - column 10, line 7 *; | [A]JPH05288035 ; | [A]US5375414 (ADAMCZYK JR ANDREW A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 39 *; | [A]JPH06235320 ; | [A]US4934142 (HAYASHI KOTARO [JP], et al); | [A]US5355672 (ADAMCZYK JR ANDREW A [US], et al) | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931025), vol. 017, no. 584, Database accession no. (M - 1501), & JP05171929 A 19930709 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [YD] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931215), vol. 017, no. 686, Database accession no. (M - 1529), & JP05231134 A 19930907 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940208), vol. 018, no. 076, Database accession no. (M - 1556), & JP05288035 A 19931102 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941122), vol. 018, no. 613, Database accession no. (M - 1709), & JP06235320 A 19940823 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |